NJ A1641 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A1071

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Engrossed on September 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-26 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires electric public utilities to provide priority power restoration to certain medical facilities, assisted living facilities, and nursing homes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires electric public utilities to provide priority power restoration to certain medical facilities, assisted living facilities, and nursing homes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-09-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-26SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
2016-09-15AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
2016-05-19AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-01-27AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1071 (Carry Over) 2014-10-16 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S876 (Same As) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback