NJ A1630 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A5901

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires school districts to take certain actions in circumstances when school meal bill is in arrears; prohibits shaming students with school meal bills in arrears; prohibits certain district actions in collecting unpaid school meal fees.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires school districts to take certain actions in circumstances when school meal bill is in arrears; prohibits shaming students with school meal bills in arrears; prohibits certain district actions in collecting unpaid school meal fees.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
2020-02-24AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (79-0-0)
2020-02-13AssemblyReported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2020-01-14AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5901 (Carry Over) 2019-11-18 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S599 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback