NJ A1578 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-09 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes "Truck Operator Independent Contractor Act."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes "Truck Operator Independent Contractor Act."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S1450 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 30 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-09-09AssemblyAbsolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
2013-05-30SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (21-17)
2013-05-30SenateSubstituted for S1450 (1R)
2013-05-20SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2013-05-20AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (43-30-5)
2013-03-14AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2013-03-14AssemblyRecommitted to Assembly Transportation, Public Works and Independent Authorities Committee
2012-10-15AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2012-01-10AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1450 (Same As) 2013-05-30 - Substituted by A1578 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback