NJ A1540 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A532

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes special Support Our Veterans license plate with proceeds supporting New Jersey homeless veteran's centers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes special Support Our Veterans license plate with proceeds supporting New Jersey homeless veteran's centers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-11-30 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-30SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2017-11-30SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2017-06-22SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
2017-06-22AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
2017-06-15AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-01-27AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

A532 (Carry Over) 2014-01-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S2322 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback