NJ A152 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1261
Note: Carry Over of previous A3084
Note: Carry Over of previous A3084
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-03 - Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-03 - Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases personal needs allowance to at least $50 for low-income persons residing in certain facilities.
Title
Increases personal needs allowance to at least $50 for low-income persons residing in certain facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 17 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-03 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2016-03-14 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (57-17-1) |
2016-03-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-03-03 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A152 (Carry Over) 2016-11-03 - Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A3084 (Carry Over) 2015-05-07 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S843 (Same As) 2016-03-07 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A3084 (Carry Over) 2015-05-07 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S843 (Same As) 2016-03-07 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/A152 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/A0500/152_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=A152 |