NJ A15 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-08 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-08 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Raises minimum wage rate to $10.10, makes further increases over a four-year period, and maintains annual cost of living increases.*
Title
Raises minimum wage rate to $10.10, makes further increases over a four-year period, and maintains annual cost of living increases.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Table Motion (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S15 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 49 N: 25 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 49 N: 25 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 31 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S15 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 49 N: 25 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 49 N: 25 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 31 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-08 | Assembly | Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (21-18) |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Motion To Table (21-16) (Weinberg) |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Motion To Sa (Kyrillos) |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Substituted for S15 |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (42-31-1) |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | Motion To Table (49-25-0) (Wisniewski) |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | Motion To Aa (Rible) |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | Motion To Table (49-25-0) (Wisniewski) |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | Motion To As (Carroll) |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S15 (Same As) 2016-06-23 - Substituted by A15 (ACS)
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/A15 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/A0500/15_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=A15 |