NJ A1470 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A4577

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S2976 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires health benefits coverage for donated human breast milk under certain conditions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires health benefits coverage for donated human breast milk under certain conditions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-30 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-08AssemblySubstituted by S2976 (1R)
2017-12-18AssemblyReported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2017-11-30AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2016-01-27AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4577 (Carry Over) 2015-10-02 - Reviewed by the Pension and Health Benefits Commission Recommend not to enact
S2976 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (66-1-2)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback