NJ A1380 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3280
Note: Carry Over of previous A5959
Note: Carry Over of previous A5959
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-02 - Combined with A869 (ACS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-02 - Combined with A869 (ACS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires residential landlords to install protective covers on steam radiators.
Title
Requires residential landlords to install protective covers on steam radiators.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Assembly | Combined with A869 (ACS) |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1380 (Carry Over) 2021-06-02 - Combined with A869 (ACS)
A5959 (Carry Over) 2019-11-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
S1645 (Same As) 2021-02-09 - Combined with S399 (SCS)
A5959 (Carry Over) 2019-11-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
S1645 (Same As) 2021-02-09 - Combined with S399 (SCS)