NJ A1380 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A1224
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-10 - Substituted by S1126 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-10 - Substituted by S1126 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires public school districts to provide instruction on "New Jersey Safe Haven Infant Protection Act" as part of core curriculum content standards.
Title
Requires public school districts to provide instruction on "New Jersey Safe Haven Infant Protection Act" as part of core curriculum content standards.
Sponsors
Sen. Anthony M. Bucco [R] | Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] | Rep. Jay Webber [R] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] |
Rep. Harold Wirths [R] | Sen. Parker Space [R] | Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Assembly | Substituted by S1126 (2R) |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1224 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S1126 (Same As) 2019-08-23 - Approved P.L.2019, c.250.
S1126 (Same As) 2019-08-23 - Approved P.L.2019, c.250.