NJ A1353 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4107
Note: Carry Over of previous S3126
Note: Carry Over of previous S3126
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on February 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on February 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires drivers to stop at railroad crossing when on-track equipment is approaching railroad crossing.
Title
Requires drivers to stop at railroad crossing when on-track equipment is approaching railroad crossing.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. BettyLou DeCroce [R] | Rep. Nicholas Chiaravalloti [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Withdrawn from Consideration |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4107 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S3126
S3126 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.422.
S3126 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.422.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A1353 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A1500/1353_I1.HTM |