NJ A1322 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1339
Note: Carry Foward to future S2331
Note: Carry Over of previous A419
Note: Carry Over of previous S2248
Note: Carry Foward to future S2331
Note: Carry Over of previous A419
Note: Carry Over of previous S2248
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Pending: Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Pending: Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires health insurers, SHBP and SEHBP to provide coverage for diagnosis, evaluation and treatment of lymphedema.
Title
Requires health insurers, SHBP and SEHBP to provide coverage for diagnosis, evaluation and treatment of lymphedema.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1322 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
A1322 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
A419 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
S1960 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S2248 (Carry Over) 2018-03-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A1322 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
A419 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
S1960 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S2248 (Carry Over) 2018-03-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A1322 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A1500/1322_I1.HTM |