NJ A1299 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A1753

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Substituted by S865 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Permits public-private partnership agreements for certain building and highway infrastructure projects; provides for EDA oversight.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits public-private partnership agreements for certain building and highway infrastructure projects; provides for EDA oversight.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-25AssemblySubstituted by S865 (3R)
2018-06-25AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Greenwald)
2018-06-21AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
2018-05-24AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Karabinchak)
2018-05-10AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1753 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S865 (Same As) 2018-08-14 - Approved P.L.2018, c.90.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback