NJ A1238 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4732
Note: Carry Over of previous S3232
Note: Carry Over of previous S3232
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce, Economic Development and Agriculture Committee
Pending: Assembly Commerce, Economic Development and Agriculture Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce, Economic Development and Agriculture Committee
Pending: Assembly Commerce, Economic Development and Agriculture Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides gross income tax deduction for costs of purchasing and installing whole house backup electrical generator for resident taxpayer's principal residence.
Title
Provides gross income tax deduction for costs of purchasing and installing whole house backup electrical generator for resident taxpayer's principal residence.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce, Economic Development and Agriculture Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4732 (Carry Over) 2022-10-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
S3232 (Carry Over) 2022-10-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A5482 (Same As) 2025-03-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce, Economic Development and Agriculture Committee
S3232 (Carry Over) 2022-10-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A5482 (Same As) 2025-03-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce, Economic Development and Agriculture Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A1238 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A1500/1238_I1.HTM |