NJ A1238 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-31 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires destruction of records stored on digital copy machines under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires destruction of records stored on digital copy machines under certain circumstances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-31SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
2012-05-24AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (51-28-0)
2012-03-15AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Moriarty)
2012-03-05AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2012-03-05AssemblyRecommitted to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
2012-01-30AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2012-01-10AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1777 (Same As) 2012-03-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback