NJ A1221 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A4980

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires emergency contact information and access instructions for social services hotline to be provided to tenants of multiple dwellings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires emergency contact information and access instructions for social services hotline to be provided to tenants of multiple dwellings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-13AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-01-14AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4980 (Carry Over) 2019-05-13 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S1148 (Same As) 2020-09-21 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback