NJ A1191 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S547
Note: Carry Foward to future A5063
Note: Carry Over of previous A4627
Note: Carry Over of previous S3165
Note: Carry Foward to future A5063
Note: Carry Over of previous A4627
Note: Carry Over of previous S3165
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "Innovation Partnership"; provides funding for certain nonprofit partnerships to promote certain emerging technology businesses.
Title
Establishes "Innovation Partnership"; provides funding for certain nonprofit partnerships to promote certain emerging technology businesses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-1-0) |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1191 (Carry Over) 2021-06-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A1191 (Carry Over) 2021-06-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A4627 (Carry Over) 2018-10-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee
S3165 (Carry Over) 2018-11-26 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A1191 (Carry Over) 2021-06-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A4627 (Carry Over) 2018-10-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee
S3165 (Carry Over) 2018-11-26 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee