NJ A1144 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A833
Note: Carry Over of previous A2537
Note: Carry Over of previous S3151
Note: Carry Over of previous A2537
Note: Carry Over of previous S3151
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Waives certain professional and occupational licensing fees for veterans and spouses of veterans.
Title
Waives certain professional and occupational licensing fees for veterans and spouses of veterans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A833 (Carry Over) 2023-06-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2537 (Carry Over) 2023-03-23 - Combined with A833 (ACS)
S3151 (Carry Over) 2022-11-07 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2537 (Carry Over) 2023-03-23 - Combined with A833 (ACS)
S3151 (Carry Over) 2022-11-07 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A1144 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A1500/1144_I1.HTM |