NJ A1096 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A3786

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes parent or guardian to place security freeze on child's consumer report.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes parent or guardian to place security freeze on child's consumer report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
2018-05-24AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (74-0-0)
2018-05-07AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3786 (Carry Over) 2016-05-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
S2678 (Same As) 2018-06-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback