NJ A1096 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1515
Note: Carry Over of previous A3786
Note: Carry Over of previous A3786
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes parent or guardian to place security freeze on child's consumer report.
Title
Authorizes parent or guardian to place security freeze on child's consumer report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0) |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1096 (Carry Over) 2018-05-31 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A3786 (Carry Over) 2016-05-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
S2678 (Same As) 2018-06-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A3786 (Carry Over) 2016-05-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
S2678 (Same As) 2018-06-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee