NJ A1069 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1953
Note: Carry Over of previous A3133
Note: Carry Over of previous A3133
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-12 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-12 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DEP to establish "private wildlife habitat certification program"; creates affirmative defense against municipal nuisance ordinances for properties certified under the program.
Title
Requires DEP to establish "private wildlife habitat certification program"; creates affirmative defense against municipal nuisance ordinances for properties certified under the program.
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Bramnick [R] | Sen. John Burzichelli [D] | Rep. Nancy Munoz [R] | Rep. Elizabeth Maher Muoio [D] |
Rep. Reed Gusciora [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2017-03-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1069 (Carry Over) 2017-06-12 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A3133 (Carry Over) 2015-06-29 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S1151 (Same As) 2016-02-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A3133 (Carry Over) 2015-06-29 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S1151 (Same As) 2016-02-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee