NJ A1029 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A4734

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Allows municipality to issue permits to sell alcoholic beverages in residential redevelopment areas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows municipality to issue permits to sell alcoholic beverages in residential redevelopment areas.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4734 (Carry Over) 2017-03-20 - INT 1RA REF ARO
S2168 (Same As) 2018-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback