NJ A1024 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A659
Note: Carry Over of previous A3520
Note: Carry Over of previous A3520
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-11-14 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-11-14 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs Commissioner of Education to appoint coordinator and regional consultants to coordinate the education of students with traumatic brain injury.
Title
Directs Commissioner of Education to appoint coordinator and regional consultants to coordinate the education of students with traumatic brain injury.
Sponsors
Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] | Rep. Adam Taliaferro [D] |
Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Rep. Nicholas Chiaravalloti [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-11-14 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-14 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1024 (Carry Over) 2016-11-14 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A3520 (Carry Over) 2014-07-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S2698 (Same As) 2016-10-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A3520 (Carry Over) 2014-07-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S2698 (Same As) 2016-10-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee