NJ A1001 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2777
Note: Carry Foward to future S2248
Note: Carry Over of previous A3612
Note: Carry Over of previous S2573
Note: Carry Foward to future S2248
Note: Carry Over of previous A3612
Note: Carry Over of previous S2573
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-15 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-15 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits DMVA to receive voluntary contributions for veteran suicide prevention public service announcements.
Title
Permits DMVA to receive voluntary contributions for veteran suicide prevention public service announcements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1001 (Carry Over) 2021-11-15 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A1001 (Carry Over) 2021-11-15 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A3612 (Carry Over) 2019-05-24 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S2573 (Carry Over) 2018-05-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A1001 (Carry Over) 2021-11-15 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A3612 (Carry Over) 2019-05-24 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S2573 (Carry Over) 2018-05-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee