NH HJR1 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Lay on Table (Rep. Backus): Motion Adopted DV 310-10 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 37
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Supporting efforts to develop wind power off the New Hampshire coast.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supporting efforts to develop wind power off the New Hampshire coast.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14HouseLay on Table (Rep. Backus): Motion Adopted DV 310-10 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 37
2019-03-07HouseSpecial Order to 03/14/2019 Without Objection House Journal 8 P. 60
2019-02-27HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/07/2019 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 19
2019-02-13HouseExecutive Session: 02/19/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 304
2019-02-06HousePublic Hearing: 02/13/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 304
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 3 P. 14

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback