NH HB682 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pending Motion OT3rdg; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a water resources fund in the department of environmental services and charging certain application and permit fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a water resources fund in the department of environmental services and charging certain application and permit fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - House - OTP (Y: 201 N: 147 NV: 11 Abs: 41) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15SenatePending Motion OT3rdg; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
2019-05-15SenateSen. Feltes Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
2019-05-15SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
2019-05-09SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/15/2019; Senate Calendar 22
2019-04-17SenateHearing: 04/23/2019, Room 103, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 19
2019-04-12SenateIntroduced 04/11/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 13
2019-04-04HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1287h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/04/2019
2019-04-04HouseAmendment # 2019-1287h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/04/2019
2019-03-28HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1287h for 04/04/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 8
2019-03-26HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 03/27/2019 09:50 am Legislative Office Building 202
2019-03-20House==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 03/26/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 203
2019-03-19HouseExecutive Session: 03/27/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2019-03-19HouseFull Committee Work Session: 03/26/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2019-03-19House==TIME CHANGE== Subcommittee Work Session: 03/25/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2019-03-19HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 03/22/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2019-03-13HouseFull Committee Work Session: 03/18/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202
2019-03-06HousePublic Hearing: 03/13/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Ways and Means 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 21
2019-02-28HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 201-147 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 18
2019-02-21HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-02-21HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/27/2019 (Vote 10-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 25
2019-01-30HouseExecutive Session: 02/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305
2019-01-23HousePublic Hearing: 02/05/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 305
2019-01-16HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 3 P. 25

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback