NH HB444 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 202-167 03/16/2023 House Journal 9 P. 31
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 202-167 03/16/2023 House Journal 9 P. 31
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting possession of a firearm at a polling place.
Title
Prohibiting possession of a firearm at a polling place.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-16 - House - ITL (Y: 202 N: 167 NV: 7 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - ITL (Y: 202 N: 167 NV: 7 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - ITL (Y: 202 N: 167 NV: 7 Abs: 22) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 202-167 03/16/2023 House Journal 9 P. 31 |
2023-03-03 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2023-03-03 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB444-FN 02/16/2023 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 11 |
2023-02-07 | House | Executive Session: 02/16/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 02/08/2023 02:30 pm State House Reps Hall |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 3 P. 16 |