NH HB351 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-22 - Indefinitely Postpone (Rep. Janvrin): Motion Adopted DV 202-183 03/22/2023 House Journal 10 P. 53
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-22 - Indefinitely Postpone (Rep. Janvrin): Motion Adopted DV 202-183 03/22/2023 House Journal 10 P. 53
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the negligent storage of firearms and relative to firearm safety devices.
Title
Relative to the negligent storage of firearms and relative to firearm safety devices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-22 - House - OTP (Y: 182 N: 203 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2023-03-22 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 184 N: 196 NV: 6 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2023-03-22 - House - OTP (Y: 182 N: 203 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2023-03-22 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 184 N: 196 NV: 7 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2023-03-22 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 184 N: 196 NV: 6 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2023-03-22 - House - OTP (Y: 182 N: 203 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2023-03-22 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 184 N: 196 NV: 7 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | House | Indefinitely Postpone (Rep. Janvrin): Motion Adopted DV 202-183 03/22/2023 House Journal 10 P. 53 |
2023-03-22 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 182-203 03/22/2023 House Journal 10 P. 50 |
2023-03-22 | House | Amendment # 2023-0592h: Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 184-196 03/22/2023 House Journal 10 P. 47 |
2023-03-14 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2023-03-14 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0592h (NT) 02/17/2023 (Vote 10-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 15 |
2023-02-07 | House | Executive Session: 02/16/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 02/08/2023 01:45 pm State House Reps Hall |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 3 P. 12 |