NE LR91 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-27 - Notice of hearing for December 15, 2017
Pending: Legislature Nebraska Retirement Systems Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-27 - Notice of hearing for December 15, 2017
Pending: Legislature Nebraska Retirement Systems Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to examine the public employees' retirement systems administered by the Public Employees Retirement Board
Title
Interim study to examine the public employees' retirement systems administered by the Public Employees Retirement Board
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-27 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for December 15, 2017 |
2017-11-27 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for December 01, 2017 (cancel) |
2017-09-18 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for December 01, 2017 |
2017-05-15 | Legislature | Referred to Nebraska Retirement Systems Committee |
2017-04-05 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2017-04-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=32315 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LR91.pdf |