NE LR6 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution to Congress for convention of the states to propose amendments to the U.S. Constitution
Title
Resolution to Congress for convention of the states to propose amendments to the U.S. Constitution
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-03-01 | Legislature | Linehan name added |
2018-02-28 | Legislature | Murante name added |
2018-02-13 | Legislature | Hilgers name added |
2018-01-16 | Legislature | Groene name added |
2018-01-04 | Legislature | Ebke name withdrawn |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover resolution |
2017-05-15 | Legislature | Groene name withdrawn |
2017-04-10 | Legislature | Chambers MO74 withdrawn |
2017-04-10 | Legislature | Chambers MO74 Bracket until June 2, 2017 filed |
2017-04-10 | Legislature | Halloran AM758 pending |
2017-04-04 | Legislature | Ebke AM753 filed |
2017-04-03 | Legislature | Friesen AM757 filed |
2017-03-31 | Legislature | Lindstrom AM755 filed |
2017-03-31 | Legislature | Halloran AM758 filed |
2017-03-20 | Legislature | Clements name added |
2017-03-07 | Legislature | Halloran priority resolution |
2017-02-27 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2017-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 01, 2017 |
2017-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2017-01-09 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=30679 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LR6.pdf |