NE LR533 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-14 - Notice of hearing for September 24, 2010 (cancelled)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-14 - Notice of hearing for September 24, 2010 (cancelled)
Summary
Interim study to examine the State Natural Gas Regulation Act
Title
Interim study to examine the State Natural Gas Regulation Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-14 | Notice of hearing for September 24, 2010 (cancelled) | |
2010-08-16 | Notice of hearing for September 24, 2010 | |
2010-04-07 | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee | |
2010-03-29 | Referred to Executive Board | |
2010-03-29 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=11419 |