NE LR477 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 12 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Notice of hearing for November 10, 2020
Pending: Legislature Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Interim study to examine the definition and interpretation of cigarette by the Dept. of Revenue for purposes of taxation and the Master Settlement Agreement

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Interim study to examine the definition and interpretation of cigarette by the Dept. of Revenue for purposes of taxation and the Master Settlement Agreement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-21LegislatureNotice of hearing for November 10, 2020
2020-10-15LegislatureNotice of hearing for November 10, 2020
2020-08-13LegislatureReferred to Revenue Committee
2020-08-12LegislatureLaid over
2020-08-12LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback