NE LR453 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-24 - Notice of hearing for October 22, 2010
Status: Introduced on March 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-24 - Notice of hearing for October 22, 2010
Summary
Interim study to examine what are described as food deserts or areas where access to healthy, affordable food choices is limited
Title
Interim study to examine what are described as food deserts or areas where access to healthy, affordable food choices is limited
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-24 | Notice of hearing for October 22, 2010 | |
2010-04-07 | Referred to Agriculture Committee | |
2010-03-25 | Referred to Executive Board | |
2010-03-25 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=11229 |