NE LR445 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-06 - Notice of hearing for August 27, 2010
Status: Introduced on March 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-06 - Notice of hearing for August 27, 2010
Summary
Interim study to examine the capabilities and resources available to the Dept. of Agriculture to meet the response protocols of state and federal livestock disease eradication programs
Title
Interim study to examine the capabilities and resources available to the Dept. of Agriculture to meet the response protocols of state and federal livestock disease eradication programs
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Carlson [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | Notice of hearing for August 27, 2010 | |
2010-04-07 | Referred to Agriculture Committee | |
2010-03-25 | Referred to Executive Board | |
2010-03-25 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=11225 |