NE LR441 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 28 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-14 - Notice of hearing for November 09, 2020
Pending: Legislature Business and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Interim study to examine issues related to paid family and medical leave

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Interim study to examine issues related to paid family and medical leave

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-14LegislatureNotice of hearing for November 09, 2020
2020-07-30LegislatureReferred to Business and Labor Committee
2020-07-28LegislatureReferred to Executive Board
2020-07-28LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback