NE LR431 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-22 - Notice of hearing for November 05, 2010
Status: Introduced on March 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-22 - Notice of hearing for November 05, 2010
Summary
Interim study to examine how private sources of money given to public institutions should be disclosed
Title
Interim study to examine how private sources of money given to public institutions should be disclosed
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Haar [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-22 | Notice of hearing for November 05, 2010 | |
2010-04-07 | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee | |
2010-03-25 | Referred to Executive Board | |
2010-03-25 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=11184 |