NE LR422 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 23 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-08 - Notice of hearing for September 24, 2010
Status: Introduced on March 23 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-08 - Notice of hearing for September 24, 2010
Summary
Interim study to review and update the General Principles of Sound Retirement Planning
Title
Interim study to review and update the General Principles of Sound Retirement Planning
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-08 | Notice of hearing for September 24, 2010 | |
2010-04-07 | Referred to Nebraska Retirement Systems Committee | |
2010-03-23 | Referred to Executive Board | |
2010-03-23 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=11175 |