NE LR417 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-17 - Notice of hearing for October 15, 2020
Pending: Legislature Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-17 - Notice of hearing for October 15, 2020
Pending: Legislature Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to examine law enforcement jurisdictions in the state and the existing policies on the use of force by law enforcement officers
Title
Interim study to examine law enforcement jurisdictions in the state and the existing policies on the use of force by law enforcement officers
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Hansen [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-17 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for October 15, 2020 |
2020-07-30 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2020-07-27 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2020-07-27 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=43035 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LR417.pdf |