NE LR41 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - President/Speaker signed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - President/Speaker signed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urge the Nebraska congressional delegation to support efforts in Congress to establish a national training center in highly infectious diseases at the University of Nebraska Medical Center
Title
Urge the Nebraska congressional delegation to support efforts in Congress to establish a national training center in highly infectious diseases at the University of Nebraska Medical Center
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2015-03-26 | Legislature | Adopted |
2015-03-20 | Legislature | Reported to the Legislature for further consideration |
2015-02-18 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 05, 2015 |
2015-01-27 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2015-01-27 | Legislature | Speaker's announcement |
2015-01-26 | Legislature | Laid over |
2015-01-26 | Legislature | Date of introduction |