NE LR381 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 23 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Presented to Secretary of State on April 4, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 23 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Presented to Secretary of State on April 4, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution to ratify the Twenty-Seventh Amendment to the United States Constitution regarding compensation for members of Congress
Title
Resolution to ratify the Twenty-Seventh Amendment to the United States Constitution regarding compensation for members of Congress
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Ebke [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Presented to Secretary of State on April 4, 2016 |
2016-04-01 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2016-04-01 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 |
2016-03-24 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2016-03-23 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2016-03-21 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2016-03-18 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2016-03-07 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2016-02-05 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 19, 2016 |
2016-01-07 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2016-01-06 | Legislature | Date of introduction |