NE LR34 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-09 - Report
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-09 - Report
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide the Executive Board reappoint the Department of Correctional Services Special Investigative Committee of the Legislature
Title
Provide the Executive Board reappoint the Department of Correctional Services Special Investigative Committee of the Legislature
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Krist [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-09 | Legislature | Report |
2015-03-02 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2015-03-02 | Legislature | Enrolled resolution |
2015-03-02 | Legislature | Correctly enrolled |
2015-02-27 | Legislature | Adopted |
2015-02-27 | Legislature | Executive Board AM290 adopted |
2015-02-12 | Legislature | Executive Board AM290 filed |
2015-02-12 | Legislature | Reported to the Legislature for further consideration with AM290 |
2015-01-29 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 06, 2015 |
2015-01-22 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2015-01-21 | Legislature | Seiler name added |
2015-01-21 | Legislature | Schumacher name added |
2015-01-21 | Legislature | Mello name added |
2015-01-21 | Legislature | Chambers name added |
2015-01-21 | Legislature | Bolz name added |
2015-01-21 | Legislature | Speaker's announcement |
2015-01-20 | Legislature | Laid over |
2015-01-20 | Legislature | Date of introduction |