NE LR334 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-06 - Notice of hearing for October 14, 2010
Status: Introduced on February 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-06 - Notice of hearing for October 14, 2010
Summary
Interim study to determine whether Nebraska's insurance laws should be amended to provide requirements relating to health benefit plan prescription drug coverage
Title
Interim study to determine whether Nebraska's insurance laws should be amended to provide requirements relating to health benefit plan prescription drug coverage
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-06 | Notice of hearing for October 14, 2010 | |
2010-04-07 | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee | |
2010-02-25 | Referred to Executive Board | |
2010-02-25 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=10723 |