NE LR307 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide the Executive Board of the Legislative Council appoint a special committee of the Legislature to be known as the Special Ethics Investigative Committee of the Legislature
Title
Provide the Executive Board of the Legislative Council appoint a special committee of the Legislature to be known as the Special Ethics Investigative Committee of the Legislature
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-03-17 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 28, 2022 |
2022-03-02 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2022-03-02 | Legislature | Speaker's announcement |
2022-02-25 | Legislature | Laid over |
2022-02-25 | Legislature | Date of introduction |