NE LR272 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-09-01 - Notice of hearing for September 23, 2015
Pending: Legislature Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-09-01 - Notice of hearing for September 23, 2015
Pending: Legislature Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to examine the Niobrara Council and its current statutory authority outlined in the Niobrara Scenic River Act
Title
Interim study to examine the Niobrara Council and its current statutory authority outlined in the Niobrara Scenic River Act
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Haar [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-01 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for September 23, 2015 |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | Referred to Natural Resources Committee |
2015-05-13 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2015-05-13 | Legislature | Date of introduction |