NE LR26 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - President/Speaker signed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - President/Speaker signed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Oppose any federal action that would rescind Deferred Action for Childhood Arrivals
Title
Oppose any federal action that would rescind Deferred Action for Childhood Arrivals
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Vargas [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2017-05-15 | Legislature | Adopted |
2017-04-12 | Legislature | Reported to the Legislature for further consideration |
2017-03-23 | Legislature | Hansen name added |
2017-03-21 | Legislature | McCollister name added |
2017-02-07 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 22, 2017 |
2017-02-06 | Legislature | Pansing Brooks name added |
2017-02-01 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2017-01-27 | Legislature | Speaker's announcement |
2017-01-27 | Legislature | Laid over |
2017-01-27 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=31869 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LR26.pdf |