NE LR247 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-14 - Notice of hearing for December 15, 2015
Pending: Legislature Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-14 - Notice of hearing for December 15, 2015
Pending: Legislature Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to examine the process of eliminating the Nebraska Oil and Gas Conservation Commission
Title
Interim study to examine the process of eliminating the Nebraska Oil and Gas Conservation Commission
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Haar [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-14 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for December 15, 2015 |
2015-08-11 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for September 22, 2015 |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | Referred to Natural Resources Committee |
2015-05-06 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2015-05-06 | Legislature | Date of introduction |