NE LR239 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on May 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-26 - Notice of hearing for October 25, 2019
Pending: Legislature Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-26 - Notice of hearing for October 25, 2019
Pending: Legislature Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to examine non-court-involved cases, including voluntary and alternative response cases, in the child welfare system
Title
Interim study to examine non-court-involved cases, including voluntary and alternative response cases, in the child welfare system
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-26 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for October 25, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=40327 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LR239.pdf |