NE LR23 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-16 - Notice of hearing for December 03, 2021
Pending: Legislature Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-16 - Notice of hearing for December 03, 2021
Pending: Legislature Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to examine the progress of natural resources districts in fulfilling their originally intended purpose
Title
Interim study to examine the progress of natural resources districts in fulfilling their originally intended purpose
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-16 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for December 03, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Legislature | Referred to Natural Resources Committee |
2021-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2021-01-14 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=43565 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/Intro/LR23.pdf |