NE LR23 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - President/Speaker signed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - President/Speaker signed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urge the United States Dept. of Veterans Affairs to provide veterans with direct access to health care services in each local community in Nebraska
Title
Urge the United States Dept. of Veterans Affairs to provide veterans with direct access to health care services in each local community in Nebraska
Sponsors
Sen. Merv Riepe [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-29 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2015-05-28 | Legislature | Adopted |
2015-05-27 | Legislature | Reported to the Legislature for further consideration |
2015-01-29 | Legislature | Mello name added |
2015-01-29 | Legislature | Coash name added |
2015-01-29 | Legislature | Watermeier name added |
2015-01-29 | Legislature | Scheer name added |
2015-01-29 | Legislature | Morfeld name added |
2015-01-29 | Legislature | Campbell name added |
2015-01-28 | Legislature | Sullivan name added |
2015-01-28 | Legislature | Smith name added |
2015-01-28 | Legislature | Seiler name added |
2015-01-28 | Legislature | Larson name added |
2015-01-28 | Legislature | Crawford name added |
2015-01-28 | Legislature | Brasch name added |
2015-01-28 | Legislature | Schilz name added |
2015-01-28 | Legislature | Murante name added |
2015-01-28 | Legislature | Krist name added |
2015-01-28 | Legislature | Kolowski name added |
2015-01-28 | Legislature | Hadley name added |
2015-01-28 | Legislature | Haar name added |
2015-01-28 | Legislature | Schumacher name added |
2015-01-28 | Legislature | Pansing Brooks name added |
2015-01-28 | Legislature | Kintner name added |
2015-01-28 | Legislature | Gloor name added |
2015-01-28 | Legislature | Bolz name added |
2015-01-28 | Legislature | Stinner name added |
2015-01-28 | Legislature | Schnoor name added |
2015-01-28 | Legislature | McCollister name added |
2015-01-28 | Legislature | Lindstrom name added |
2015-01-28 | Legislature | Ebke name added |
2015-01-28 | Legislature | Craighead name added |
2015-01-28 | Legislature | Williams name added |
2015-01-28 | Legislature | McCoy name added |
2015-01-28 | Legislature | Kuehn name added |
2015-01-28 | Legislature | Hughes name added |
2015-01-28 | Legislature | Hilkemann name added |
2015-01-28 | Legislature | Baker name added |
2015-01-28 | Legislature | Kolterman name added |
2015-01-28 | Legislature | Johnson name added |
2015-01-28 | Legislature | Groene name added |
2015-01-28 | Legislature | Friesen name added |
2015-01-28 | Legislature | Davis name added |
2015-01-28 | Legislature | Bloomfield name added |
2015-01-21 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 28, 2015 |
2015-01-20 | Legislature | Garrett name added |
2015-01-16 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2015-01-15 | Legislature | Speaker's announcement |
2015-01-14 | Legislature | Laid over |
2015-01-14 | Legislature | Date of introduction |