NE LR226 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on May 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-02 - Notice of hearing for October 20, 2017
Pending: Legislature Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-02 - Notice of hearing for October 20, 2017
Pending: Legislature Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to examine the educational and credentialing requirements and the process of applying for and obtaining an electrology license for Nebraska
Title
Interim study to examine the educational and credentialing requirements and the process of applying for and obtaining an electrology license for Nebraska
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-02 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for October 20, 2017 |
2017-05-15 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2017-05-10 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2017-05-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=33698 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LR226.pdf |