NE LR222 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-08-25 - Notice of hearing for September 25, 2015
Pending: Legislature Business and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-08-25 - Notice of hearing for September 25, 2015
Pending: Legislature Business and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to examine issues relating to family and medical leave
Title
Interim study to examine issues relating to family and medical leave
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for September 25, 2015 |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | Referred to Business and Labor Committee |
2015-04-30 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2015-04-30 | Legislature | Date of introduction |